MN HF605 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Author added Newton
Pending: House Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Author added Newton
Pending: House Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Toxic Free Kids Act; children protected from harmful chemical exposure in products, disclosure required, priority chemical identification criteria amended, Pollution Control Agency authorized to prohibit sales of children's products that contain harmful chemicals, waiver process provided, fees established, and criminal penalty provided.
Title
Toxic Free Kids Act; children protected from harmful chemical exposure in products, disclosure required, priority chemical identification criteria amended, Pollution Control Agency authorized to prohibit sales of children's products that contain harmful chemicals, waiver process provided, fees established, and criminal penalty provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Author added Newton |
2014-04-01 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2014-03-28 | House | Author added Persell |
2014-03-20 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2013-02-28 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Law |
2013-02-25 | House | Authors added Paymar, Liebling and Lillie |
2013-02-21 | House | Authors added Johnson, S.; Loeffler and Franson |
2013-02-18 | House | Author added Kahn |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |