MN HF604 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-26 - Author added Atkins.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-26 - Author added Atkins.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical assistance rates increased for chemical dependency providers, and report required.
Title
Medical assistance rates increased for chemical dependency providers, and report required.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Sen. Dan Schoen [D] |
Rep. Matthew Dean [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] |
Rep. Joe Atkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | Author added Atkins. |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2015-02-09 | House | Author added Ward. |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF633 (Similar To) 2015-03-25 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance