MN HF597 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Author added Agbaje
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Author added Agbaje
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grant program established to provide financial assistance to cities to address climate change, and money appropriated.
Title
Grant program established to provide financial assistance to cities to address climate change, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Author added Agbaje |
2023-01-25 | House | Author added Tabke |
2023-01-23 | House | Authors added Xiong; Hussein |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1388 (Similar To) 2023-03-07 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Energy, Utilities, Environment, and Climate