MN HF592 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of veterans affairs authorized to establish veterans stable housing initiative, homeless veterans data classified, and data sharing authorized.
Title
Commissioner of veterans affairs authorized to establish veterans stable housing initiative, homeless veterans data classified, and data sharing authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Reyer |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Sandstede, Lippert, Sundin, Berg, Lillie, Bahner and Hollins |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF363 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Second reading