MN HF59 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safe routes to school grant program funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Safe routes to school grant program funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] |
Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-01-17 | House | Author added Lueck |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF418 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Capital Investment