MN HF586 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Volunteer driver defined, and technical and conforming changes made.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Volunteer driver defined, and technical and conforming changes made.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18HouseSecond reading
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2021-03-15HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy
2021-02-25HouseAuthor added Bahr
2021-02-10HouseAuthor added Munson
2021-02-01HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF748 (Similar To) 2021-02-15 - Authors added Coleman; Johnson Stewart

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback