MN HF586 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veteran suicide awareness day declared.
Title
Veteran suicide awareness day declared.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-03-13 | House | Authors added Boe and Poston |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-03-11 | House | Third reading |
2019-03-07 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-02-14 | House | Authors added Dettmer and Brand |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-04 | House | Author added Moller |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF814 (Similar To) 2019-02-04 - Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy