MN HF583 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Authors added Torkelson, Anderson, Boe, and Robbins
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Authors added Torkelson, Anderson, Boe, and Robbins
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Charitable bail organizations regulated.
Title
Charitable bail organizations regulated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Authors added Torkelson, Anderson, Boe, and Robbins |
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Scott |
2021-03-22 | House | Authors added Johnson and Mekeland |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Lucero |
2021-02-10 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF415 (Similar To) 2021-05-14 - Third reading Passed