MN HF58 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Secretary of State Chapter 15 05/03/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

West Lakeland Township, Bayport, and Oak Park Heights; Trunk Highway 95 segment designated as Corrections Officer Joseph Gomm Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

West Lakeland Township, Bayport, and Oak Park Heights; Trunk Highway 95 segment designated as Corrections Officer Joseph Gomm Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06 Secretary of State Chapter 15 05/03/2019
2019-05-03 Governor's action Approval
2019-05-03 Secretary of State, Filed
2019-05-03 Governor approval
2019-05-02 Presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseReturned from Senate
2019-05-01SenateThird reading Passed
2019-05-01SenateSpecial Order
2019-03-11SenateSecond reading
2019-03-11SenateComm report: To pass
2019-02-25SenateReferred to Transportation Finance and Policy
2019-02-25SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-02-25SenateReceived from House
2019-02-21HouseBill was passed
2019-02-21HouseThird reading
2019-02-21HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 21st, 2019
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-02-05HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-01-17HouseAuthor added Poston
2019-01-14HouseReferred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF417 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - HF substituted in committee HF58

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback