MN HF568 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Author added Johnson
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Emergency medical personnel authorized to provide emergency medical care to police dogs without veterinary medicine license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency medical personnel authorized to provide emergency medical care to police dogs without veterinary medicine license.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseAuthor added Johnson
2021-03-15HouseAuthor added Munson
2021-03-04HouseAuthors added Sundin, Robbins, Daniels, Boe, Erickson, and Backer
2021-02-25HouseAuthors added Theis, Sandstede
2021-02-08HouseAuthor added Huot
2021-02-01HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF952 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Authors added Housley; Dornink; Tomassoni; Limmer

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback