MN HF56 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lymphedema compression treatment item coverage required.
Title
Lymphedema compression treatment item coverage required.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Paul Novotny [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] |
Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Author added Bahner |
2021-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-02-08 | House | Authors added Novotny, Franson, Gruenhagen |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF97 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - Author added Wiklund