MN HF554 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred by Chair to Local Government Division
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred by Chair to Local Government Division
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local government authorized to issue licenses for barbering and cosmetology, and barbers and cosmetologists state licensing repealed.
Title
Local government authorized to issue licenses for barbering and cosmetology, and barbers and cosmetologists state licensing repealed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | Referred by Chair to Local Government Division |
2021-02-11 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed State Government Finance and Elections |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF691 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy