MN HF553 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Persell
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Farmed Cervidae regulatory duties and powers transferred from Board of Animal Health to Department of Natural Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Farmed Cervidae regulatory duties and powers transferred from Board of Animal Health to Department of Natural Resources.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Persell
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Kunesh-Podein
2019-02-25HouseAuthors added Lillie and Tabke
2019-02-21HouseAuthors added Nelson and Liebling
2019-02-07HouseAuthor added Lee
2019-01-31HouseReferred by Chair to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-31HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1359 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback