MN HF55 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Authors added O'Driscoll and Haley
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Authors added O'Driscoll and Haley
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandated health benefit proposal evaluation process modified.
Title
Mandated health benefit proposal evaluation process modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Liz Reyer [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Sen. Jordan Rasmusson [R] |
Rep. Tim O'Driscoll [R] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Authors added O'Driscoll and Haley |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Rasmusson |
2021-01-19 | House | Authors added Reyer and Bahner |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF146 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy