MN HF55 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

School meal provisions modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School meal provisions modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Bahner
2019-03-18HouseAuthors added Acomb and Kunesh-Podein
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Dettmer
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added Mann
2019-02-21HouseAuthors added Edelson and Moller
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Dehn
2019-01-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF411 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback