MN HF533 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Lippert
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Lippert
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Nonprofit health care entities conversion transactions review and approval required by attorney general, all net earnings of a nonprofit health maintenance organization required to be used for nonprofit purposes, moratorium on conversion transactions extended, and penalties imposed.
Title
Nonprofit health care entities conversion transactions review and approval required by attorney general, all net earnings of a nonprofit health maintenance organization required to be used for nonprofit purposes, moratorium on conversion transactions extended, and penalties imposed.
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] |
Rep. Todd Lippert [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Lippert |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2019-03-13 | House | Authors added Mann and Noor |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Koegel |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1984 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Author added Abeler