MN HF515 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Author added Raleigh
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Author added Raleigh
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
911 telecommunicator working group statewide standards established for training and certification, and report required.
Title
911 telecommunicator working group statewide standards established for training and certification, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Author added Raleigh |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Hollins |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Scott |
2021-02-18 | House | Author added Petersburg |
2021-02-08 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Huot |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF565 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance