MN HF505 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State flag design task force created.
Title
State flag design task force created.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] |
Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion to re-refer State Government Finance Division |
2020-02-13 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-04-10 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Long |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Liebling |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-02-04 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1763 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Author added Marty