MN HF500 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal standard time year-round beginning in 2024 and expiring upon enactment of federal law authorizing states to recognize advanced standard time year-round recognition provided.
Title
Federal standard time year-round beginning in 2024 and expiring upon enactment of federal law authorizing states to recognize advanced standard time year-round recognition provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2024-03-13 | House | Author added Frazier |
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Brand |
2023-02-06 | House | Author added Hollins |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF692 (Similar To) 2023-01-25 - Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans