MN HF50 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Easement and state land conveying and leasing requirements modified, state forests added to and deleted from, state parks added to, and sale and conveyance of land authorized.
Title
Easement and state land conveying and leasing requirements modified, state forests added to and deleted from, state parks added to, and sale and conveyance of land authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Maria Perez-Vega [D] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] |
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Samakab Hussein [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Secretary of State Chapter 9 | |
2023-02-21 | Governor's action Approval | |
2023-02-21 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2023-02-21 | Governor approval | |
2023-02-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2023-02-20 | House | Returned from Senate |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Special Order |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF75 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF75, now on General Orders |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-06 | House | Author added Hussein |
2023-02-02 | House | Bill was passed |
2023-02-02 | House | Third reading |
2023-02-01 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 2, 2023 |
2023-01-25 | House | Second reading |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-01-23 | House | Author added Hassan |
2023-01-17 | House | Authors added PĂ©rez-Vega and Lislegard |
2023-01-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-01-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF75 (Similar To) 2023-02-08 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF50, SF indefinitely postponed