MN HF5 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Paid family, pregnancy, bonding, and applicant's serious medical condition benefits provided; employment leaves regulated and required; data classified; and rulemaking authorized.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paid family, pregnancy, bonding, and applicant's serious medical condition benefits provided; employment leaves regulated and required; data classified; and rulemaking authorized.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House: Recall and Re-refer (Y: 57 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseSecond reading
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-04-10HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-04-01HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-04-01HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-29HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-28HouseReferred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
2019-03-26HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
2019-03-13HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion did not prevail Commerce
2019-03-11HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce
2019-01-14HouseAuthor added Loeffler
2019-01-10HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Labor

Same As/Similar To

SF1060 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback