MN HF493 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Author added Murphy
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Individual income and property tax refund provisions modified, subtraction allowed for all federally taxable Social Security income, first tier income tax rate reduced, and homestead credit state refunds increased.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual income and property tax refund provisions modified, subtraction allowed for all federally taxable Social Security income, first tier income tax rate reduced, and homestead credit state refunds increased.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-09HouseAuthor added Murphy
2023-02-01HouseAuthor added Daniels
2023-01-19HouseAuthor added Knudsen
2023-01-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Taxes

Same As/Similar To

SF1895 (Similar To) 2023-02-20 - Referred to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback