MN HF492 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Bernardy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Traffic violations that cause great bodily harm or death to another misdemeanor established.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic violations that cause great bodily harm or death to another misdemeanor established.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2019-03-25HouseSecond reading
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-03-20HouseMotion prevailed
2019-03-20HouseMotion to re-refer Ways and Means
2019-03-14HouseSecond reading
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-02-28HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Transportation Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-04HouseAuthor added Neu
2019-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF2127 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Author added Draheim

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback