MN HF491 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

School employees, independent contractors, and persons in positions of authority who have sexual relationships with students penalties established.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School employees, independent contractors, and persons in positions of authority who have sexual relationships with students penalties established.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Policy
2019-02-11HouseAuthor added Robbins
2019-02-04HouseAuthor added Moller
2019-01-31HouseAuthor added Kunesh-Podein
2019-01-30HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-01-28HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1316 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback