MN HF485 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Sandstede
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Pharmaceutical assistance program established, insulin assistance account in the special revenue fund established, fees and penalties established, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmaceutical assistance program established, insulin assistance account in the special revenue fund established, fees and penalties established, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Sandstede
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Brand
2019-03-13HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Freiberg
2019-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Poston
2019-02-07HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Commerce
2019-02-04HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF472 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback