MN HF480 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal sexual conduct definitions amended, criminal sexual conduct offenses expanded for persons in current or recent positions of authority over juveniles, affirmative defenses to criminal sexual conduct charges eliminated, and statute of limitations removed for felony criminal sexual offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal sexual conduct definitions amended, criminal sexual conduct offenses expanded for persons in current or recent positions of authority over juveniles, affirmative defenses to criminal sexual conduct charges eliminated, and statute of limitations removed for felony criminal sexual offenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Bahner
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Poston
2019-02-04HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-01-28HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF2521 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback