MN HF478 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal charges against veterans with service-related disorders discharge and dismissal required.
Title
Criminal charges against veterans with service-related disorders discharge and dismissal required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Author added Bahner |
2021-04-09 | House | Authors added Youakim and Bernardy |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-08 | House | Author added Huot |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Long |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Keeler |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Frederick |
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Moller |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |