MN HF476 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Boat insurance; property and casualty policy exclusion coverage regulated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boat insurance; property and casualty policy exclusion coverage regulated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House: Passage (Y: 70 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Scott Amendment to Jurgens Amendment (Y: 52 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House: O'Driscoll Amendment to Jurgens Amendment (Y: 52 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House: (Y: 74 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 49 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Passage (Y: 70 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Scott Amendment to Jurgens Amendment (Y: 52 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House: O'Driscoll Amendment to Jurgens Amendment (Y: 52 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House: (Y: 74 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 49 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2019-03-04SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-03-04SenateReceived from House
2019-02-28HouseAuthors stricken Hamilton
2019-02-28HouseBill was passed
2019-02-28HouseThird reading
2019-02-28HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken
2019-02-28HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken
2019-02-28HouseAmendments offered
2019-02-27HouseAuthor stricken Daniels
2019-02-27HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 28, 2019
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Klevorn
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Daniels
2019-02-14HouseAuthor stricken Baker
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-02-07HouseAuthor stricken Garofalo
2019-01-31HouseAuthor stricken Theis
2019-01-31HouseAuthor stricken Albright
2019-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF1002 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0476&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF476&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=35
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=36
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=37
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=38
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=39
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=40
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=41
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=35
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=36
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=37
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=38
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=39
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=40
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0476&session_number=0&year=2019&id=41

Bill Comments

feedback