MN HF4741 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homeownership education, counseling, and training program expanded to include specialized homeownership education for veterans.
Title
Homeownership education, counseling, and training program expanded to include specialized homeownership education for veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Author added Bierman |
2022-05-03 | House | Author added Mariani |
2022-04-28 | House | Author added Franson |
2022-04-27 | House | Author added Davids |
2022-04-26 | House | Author added Moran |
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Nelson, M. |
2022-04-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4483 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Referred to Housing Finance and Policy