MN HF4648 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Authors added Theis and O'Neiill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Authors added Theis and O'Neiill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency declaration by Governor method modified, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Title
Emergency declaration by Governor method modified, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - House - House: MOTION TO SUSPEND RULES (Y: 60 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | House | Authors added Theis and O'Neiill |
2020-05-13 | House | Authors added Backer, Daniels, Lucero, Poston, Bennett, Erickson, and Dettmer |
2020-05-12 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2020-05-12 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2020-05-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF4629 (Similar To) 2020-05-17 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections