MN HF4611 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-16 - Author added Moller
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-16 - Author added Moller
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; emergency community relief grant program established, and money appropriated.
Title
COVID-19; emergency community relief grant program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-16 | House | Author added Moller |
2020-05-15 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-05-13 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-05-12 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-05-09 | House | Authors added Bernardy and Pinto |
2020-04-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4540 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy