MN HF4601 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 113
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 113
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Human services commissioner required to award opiate epidemic response account grants.
Title
Human services commissioner required to award opiate epidemic response account grants.
Sponsors
Rep. Erin Koegel [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-17 - House - House: MESSAGES FROM THE SENATE (Y: 123 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 124 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 124 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State Chapter 113 | |
2020-05-27 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-27 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-17 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate |
2020-05-17 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2020-05-17 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-05-17 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2020-05-17 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2020-05-17 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-05-13 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2020-05-13 | House | Third reading as amended |
2020-05-13 | House | Amended |
2020-05-11 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 13, 2020 |
2020-05-09 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-04-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4577 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy