MN HF4592 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peacetime emergency duration extension legislative approval required, and peacetime emergency duration extension limited.
Title
Peacetime emergency duration extension legislative approval required, and peacetime emergency duration extension limited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | House | Author added Robbins |
2020-05-05 | House | Author added Fabian |
2020-04-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF4519 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Third reading Passed