MN HF4576 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reemploying retired members of PERA and MSRS requirements amended, and requirements amended relating to members who continue employment under postretirement option under PERA or MSRS.
Title
Reemploying retired members of PERA and MSRS requirements amended, and requirements amended relating to members who continue employment under postretirement option under PERA or MSRS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-04-28 | House | Authors added Youakim and Freiberg |
2020-04-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF4498 (Similar To) 2020-04-20 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections