MN HF4568 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Author added Klevorn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Author added Klevorn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Information and telecommunications technology systems and services protected during emergencies.
Title
Information and telecommunications technology systems and services protected during emergencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] |
Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Ginny Klevorn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Author added Klevorn |
2022-03-30 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-03-24 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed State Government Finance and Elections |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
Same As/Similar To
SF4388 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Author added Wiklund