MN HF4554 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-16 - Bill was passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-16 - Bill was passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources funding provided, various provisions and prior appropriations modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Environment and natural resources funding provided, various provisions and prior appropriations modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-16 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 74 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-16 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-16 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-16 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-16 | House | Amendments offered |
2020-05-16 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-05-16 | House | Motion for reconsideration third reading |
2020-05-16 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-16 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 16, 2020 |
2020-05-13 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-04-17 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2020-04-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4499 (Similar To) 2020-05-16 - Third reading Passed