MN HF453 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Author added Hornstein.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Author added Hornstein.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Acts resulting in death or bodily harm to a pet or companion animal criminal penalties provided, and criminal penalties modified.
Title
Acts resulting in death or bodily harm to a pet or companion animal criminal penalties provided, and criminal penalties modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Fenton [R] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] |
Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Hornstein. |
2018-03-15 | House | Author added Dehn, R. |
2018-03-08 | House | Authors added Clark, Ward, and Mariani. |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF252 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Author added Bigham