MN HF4514 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
United States Postal Service; a resolution urging Congress to ensure that the USPS remains an independent establishment of the government and is not subject to privatization.
Title
United States Postal Service; a resolution urging Congress to ensure that the USPS remains an independent establishment of the government and is not subject to privatization.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Sen. Tou Xiong [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] |
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] |
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2020-04-17 | House | Author added Koegel |
2020-04-14 | House | Authors added Lien, Moran, Her |
2020-04-07 | House | Authors added Sundin; Lillie; Ecklund; Xiong, T.; Bernardy; Richardson; Huot; Mariani; Jordan |
2020-03-26 | House | Author added Lee |
2020-03-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF4455 (Similar To) 2020-04-14 - Author added Klein