MN HF4510 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-20 - Author added Fischer.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-20 - Author added Fischer.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Collective bargaining; constitutional amendment proposed.
Title
Collective bargaining; constitutional amendment proposed.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
Rep. Susan Allen [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] |
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2018-05-18 | House | Authors added Bly, Hornstein, Ecklund, Schultz, and Olson. |
2018-05-17 | House | Authors added Mariani; Lillie; Pinto; Dehn, R.; Koegel; Lee; Metsa; and Lesch. |
2018-05-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4083 (Similar To) 2018-05-15 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections