MN HF45 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Division action, return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Automatic voter registration of applicants for a driver's license, instruction permit, or state identification card provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatic voter registration of applicants for a driver's license, instruction permit, or state identification card provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-02-07HouseReferred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-01-30HouseDivision action, return to Government Operations
2019-01-19HouseReferred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections
2019-01-17HouseAuthors added Edelson, Vang and Loeffler
2019-01-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF612 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - Author added Rest

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback