MN HF45 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - House: Author added McFarlane
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Penalty provided for careless driving resulting in death, and providing for revocation of violator's driver's license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Penalty provided for careless driving resulting in death, and providing for revocation of violator's driver's license.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-28 House: Author added McFarlane
2009-03-31 House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance
2009-03-30 House: Authors added Brown, Scalze and Newton
2009-03-18 House: Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
2009-03-18 House: Recalled by Chair Finance
2009-02-22 House: Referred by Chair to Public Safety Finance Division
2009-02-19 House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Finance
2009-02-05 House: Author added Urdahl
2009-01-29 House: Author added Slocum
2009-01-26 House: Authors added Tillberry and Bly
2009-01-22 House: Authors added Kiffmeyer and Gardner
2009-01-15 House: Authors added Emmer, Kohls, Morgan and Brynaert
2009-01-12 House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Policy and Oversight

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback