MN HF4484 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Authors added Schultz and Olson, L.
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Authors added Schultz and Olson, L.
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Duluth Air National Guard Base new aircraft shelter funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Duluth Air National Guard Base new aircraft shelter funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Spencer Igo [R] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] |
Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Authors added Schultz and Olson, L. |
2022-04-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Capital Investment |
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Igo |
2022-03-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4261 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance