MN HF446 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Author added Knudsen
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Author added Knudsen
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax provisions modified, and property tax exemption established for property owned and operated by a congressionally chartered veterans service organization.
Title
Property tax provisions modified, and property tax exemption established for property owned and operated by a congressionally chartered veterans service organization.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Mark Wiens [R] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Rep. Isaac Schultz [R] |
Rep. Bernie Perryman [R] | Rep. Krista Knudsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Author added Knudsen |
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Perryman |
2024-02-12 | House | Author added Schultz |
2023-03-15 | House | Author added Newton |
2023-01-19 | House | Author added Wiens |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF121 (Similar To) 2023-01-11 - Author added Howe