MN HF4437 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Authors added O'Driscoll, Anselmo, and West.
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State general sales tax revenue related to motor vehicle repair and replacement parts allocated exclusively to fund roads, conforming and technical changes made, and constitutional amendment proposed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State general sales tax revenue related to motor vehicle repair and replacement parts allocated exclusively to fund roads, conforming and technical changes made, and constitutional amendment proposed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - House: Passage (Y: 76 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseAuthors added O'Driscoll, Anselmo, and West.
2018-05-17SenateReferred to Taxes
2018-05-17SenateIntroduction and first reading
2018-05-17SenateReceived from House
2018-05-17HouseBill was passed vote: 76-54
2018-05-17HouseThird reading
2018-05-15HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 17, 2018
2018-05-14HouseSecond reading
2018-05-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2018-05-09HouseAuthor added Christensen.
2018-05-09HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2018-05-08HouseJoint rule 2.03 waived
2018-05-08HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
2018-05-07HouseAuthors added Gruenhagen and Garofalo.
2018-04-30HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2018-04-30HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes
2018-04-24HouseAuthors added Howe and Kresha.
2018-04-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF3837 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Author added Jasinski

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback