MN HF4433 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-3)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Author added Daniels.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Author added Daniels.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandatory fire sprinkler installation prohibited.
Title
Mandatory fire sprinkler installation prohibited.
Sponsors
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] |
Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Randy Jessup [R] | Rep. Anne Neu Brindley [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Rep. Matthew Dean [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. Roz Peterson [R] |
Rep. Tim O'Driscoll [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] |
Rep. Matt Bliss [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] |
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Joyce Peppin [R] | Rep. Jim Knoblach [R] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] |
Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Bob Vogel [R] | Rep. Sarah Anderson [R] | Rep. Kelly Fenton [R] |
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Author added Daniels. |
2018-04-19 | House | Author added Lohmer. |
2018-04-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF3910 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy