MN HF4416 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; health plan company coverage of testing, treatment, and quarantines required.
Title
COVID-19; health plan company coverage of testing, treatment, and quarantines required.
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] |
Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | Author added Jordan |
2020-03-16 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2020-03-12 | House | Authors added Munson and Bierman |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |