MN HF4415 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

COVID-19; school closures and other amendments provided for due to COVID-19; calculation of school aids formulas due to COVID-19 clarified; forecast adjustments made to funding for general education, education excellence, teachers, special education, facilities, fund transfers and accounting, nutrition and libraries, early childhood, and community education and lifelong learning; responsibilities clarified for construction and skills trades career counseling services; operation referendum calculation clarified; and base appropriations adjusted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19; school closures and other amendments provided for due to COVID-19; calculation of school aids formulas due to COVID-19 clarified; forecast adjustments made to funding for general education, education excellence, teachers, special education, facilities, fund transfers and accounting, nutrition and libraries, early childhood, and community education and lifelong learning; responsibilities clarified for construction and skills trades career counseling services; operation referendum calculation clarified; and base appropriations adjusted.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: H.F. No 4415 (Y: 83 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: H.F. No. 4415 (Y: 58 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27 Secretary of State Chapter 116
2020-05-27 Governor's action Approval
2020-05-27 Secretary of State, Filed
2020-05-27 Governor approval
2020-05-18 Presented to Governor
2020-05-17HouseBill was repassed as amended by the Senate
2020-05-17HouseThird reading as amended by the Senate
2020-05-17HouseMotion prevailed
2020-05-17HouseMotion to concur with Senate amendments
2020-05-17HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2020-05-17SenateHouse concurred and repassed bill
2020-05-16SenateThird reading Passed
2020-05-16SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2020-05-16SenateTaken from table
2020-05-07SenateLaid on table
2020-05-07SenateSecond reading
2020-05-07SenateTaken from table
2020-05-06SenateLaid on table
2020-05-06SenateIntroduction and first reading
2020-05-06SenateReceived from House
2020-05-05HouseAuthors added Noor, Masin, Murphy
2020-05-04HouseAuthor added Brand and Bernardy
2020-05-04HouseBill was passed
2020-05-04HouseMotion did not prevail
2020-05-04HouseMotion to lay on the table
2020-05-04HouseThird reading
2020-05-04HouseAmendments offered
2020-04-30HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 4, 2020
2020-04-30HouseSecond reading
2020-04-30HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2020-04-28HouseAuthor added Becker-Finn
2020-04-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2020-04-14HouseAuthors added Bahner, Acomb
2020-04-14HouseJoint rule 2.03 waived
2020-04-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance Division
2020-04-07HouseAuthor added Hassan, Gomez
2020-03-26HouseAuthors added Cantrell, Jordan, Lippert, Kotyza-Witthuhn
2020-03-16HouseAuthors added Christensen, Bierman, Freiberg, and Wolgamott
2020-03-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF4369 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Chief author added Nelson

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF4415&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF4415&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2020&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF4415&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2020&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF4415&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2020&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF4415&version=3&session=ls91&session_year=2020&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF4415&version=4&session=ls91&session_year=2020&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF4415&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10554
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF4415&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10555
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=7184

Bill Comments

feedback