MN HF4404 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Third reading Failed to pass vote: 34-33
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Third reading Failed to pass vote: 34-33
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus bonding bill.
Title
Omnibus bonding bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 84 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 97 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-14 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 97 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-14 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Failed to pass vote: 34-33 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF4013 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF4013, now on General Orders |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-05-14 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 84-39 |
2018-05-14 | House | Third reading as amended |
2018-05-14 | House | Point of order raised multiple points of order |
2018-05-14 | House | Amended |
2018-05-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 14, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-05-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2018-04-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF4013 (Similar To) 2018-05-15 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4404