MN HF4374 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provider definition amended, and child care assistance provider reimbursement rates modified.
Title
Provider definition amended, and child care assistance provider reimbursement rates modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-05-14 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2020-05-14 | House | Reported to the House |
2020-05-12 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 14, 2020 |
2020-05-11 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-05-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-04-30 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-04-30 | House | Committee report, re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2020-04-28 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-04-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3833 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Author added Relph