MN HF4323 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Author added Bly.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Author added Bly.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal background checks for firearm transfers required, and certain transfers excepted.
Title
Criminal background checks for firearm transfers required, and certain transfers excepted.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Laurie Pryor [D] | Rep. Jack Considine [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Author added Bly. |
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Ecklund. |
2018-03-29 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3279 (Similar To) 2018-05-01 - Author stricken Jensen